RI S0287 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
2) (Mandates public school classroom size be limited to twenty (20) students for kindergarten through grade two (2).
Title
Establishing A Class Size Maximum For Kindergarten Through Grade Two
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to House Education |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/13/2021) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |