RI S0285 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implements an individual career and academic plan graduation requirement for each student enrolled in public schools in the sixth through twelfth grade, starting with students entering the sixth grade in the 2023-2024 school year.
Title
Rhode Island School-to-career Transition Act Of 1996
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to House Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/09/2021) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |