RI S0283 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a courtesy plate to be issued on the "veteran" plate design.
Title
Veteran Courtesy Registration Plate
Sponsors
Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0283.pdf |