RI S0282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of restraints on pregnant prisoners during transport to and from court proceedings by sheriffs and/or incarceration at the ACI with annual reports to the general assembly effective January 1, 2018.
Title
The Healthy Pregnancies For Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2017) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |