RI S0282 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Program Integrity For Medicaid, Rite Care And Rite Share Program (would Create A Review Process For Medicaid, Rite Care And Rite Share Payment Accuracy.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Program Integrity For Medicaid, Rite Care And Rite Share Program (would Create A Review Process For Medicaid, Rite Care And Rite Share Payment Accuracy.)
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0282.pdf |