RI S0271 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the cap on the maximum fee allowable for submitting an application for certification to the board of certifications of operators of public water supply facilities.
Title
Board Of Certification Of Operators Of Public Water Supply Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |