RI S0264 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employees of regulated financial institutions to report suspected financial exploitation of elder adults to the office of healthy aging and provide authority to the regulated financial institution to place a temporary hold on transactions.
Title
The Elder Adult Financial Exploitation Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |