RI S0260 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires 25% of price of cemetery lot be deposited in perpetual care fund (PCF). PCF to file annual report with AG.
Title
Cemeteries -- Cemetery Perpetual Funds Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0260.pdf |