RI S0256 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a voter to change their party affiliation on or before the twenty-ninth (29th) day preceding any primary election for which the voter is eligible.
Title
Registration Of Voters
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/12/2015) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |