RI S0253 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a process that provides affected employees an opportunity to purchase the business that employs them, but is in danger of being sold or going out of business.
Title
Local Ownership Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House Committee on Small Business |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |