RI S0250 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Refunds the minimum tax paid by corporations with annual gross income of less than four hundred dollars ($400); but caps the amount refunded at four hundred dollars ($400).
Title
Business Corporation Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0250.pdf |