RI S0249 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-22 - Meeting postponed (05/23/2023)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-22 - Meeting postponed (05/23/2023)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that projects previously approved for historic tax credits funded through the cultural arts and the economy grant program would continue to qualify for tax credits until June 30, 2026.
Title
Historic Preservation Tax Credits
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/23/2023) |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0249.pdf |