RI S0249 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Services -- The Rhode Island Works Program (would Allow People Initially Eligible For Child Care Assistance To Remain Eligible So Long As Their Income Does Not Exceed 225% Of The Federal Poverty Level And Child Care Is Necessary In Order To Maintain Employment.)
Title
An Act Relating To Human Services -- The Rhode Island Works Program (would Allow People Initially Eligible For Child Care Assistance To Remain Eligible So Long As Their Income Does Not Exceed 225% Of The Federal Poverty Level And Child Care Is Necessary In Order To Maintain Employment.)
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0249.pdf |