RI S0248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits financial institutions from investing in private detention centers or continuing to invest with any institution, company or subsidiary of a company that owns or contracts with a government entity to manage or run a prison.
Title
Powers And Operations
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0248.pdf |