RI S0247 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides children from birth through age five (5) with continuous coverage eligibility for RIte Track/RIte Care so that they are not at risk of losing coverage at the yearly redetermination due solely to administrative barriers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care For Children And Pregnant Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023)
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback