RI S0242 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the real property of Ocean State Community Wellness, Inc., a qualified tax-exempt corporation under ยง 501(c)(3) of the United States Internal Revenue Code, for the property located at 7450 Post Road, North Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/27/2021) |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/16/2021) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |