RI S0242 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the provisions of ยง 28-53-7 which addresses payments from the uninsured protection fund to employees of uninsured employers, would apply to injuries that occur on or after September 1, 2019.
Title
Rhode Island Uninsured Protection Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-03-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/19/2019) |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |