RI S0240 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the town of East Providence to adopt a new tax rate applicable to Class 2 property that shall not exceed by two hundred percent (200%) the rate applicable to Class 1 property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10SenateSigned by Governor
2023-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-04-25HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-04-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/25/2023)
2023-04-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2023-04-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/19/2023)
2023-03-31HouseReferred to House Municipal Government & Housing
2023-03-30SenateSenate passed Sub A
2023-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/30/2023)
2023-03-28SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-03-27SenateProposed Substitute
2023-03-24SenateScheduled for consideration (03/28/2023)
2023-03-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023)
2023-03-14SenateMeeting postponed (03/14/2023)
2023-03-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback