RI S0239 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation real property acquired or leased by a railroad entity used in the boarding or disembarking of railroad passengers or supporting passenger railroad operations and services with a lack of use sunset provision.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub B |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee continued |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee heard |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |