RI S0238 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the interval of time within which a municipality must conduct an update of its last real property revaluation.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2015) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |