RI S0237 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that prisoners who were sentenced as adults for offenses committed prior to age eighteen would be eligible for parole after fifteen years.
Title
Parole
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2017) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |