RI S0232 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the sale of electronic nicotine-delivery systems without having a license to sell cigarettes and/or tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017)
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback