RI S0230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes assault and battery upon delivery persons a felony and mandates a maximum sentence of imprisonment of 3 years. Persons convicted of such an assault and battery while using a dangerous weapon, the minimum sentence is imprisonment for 5 years.
Title
Assaults
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |