RI S0228 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Workers' Compensation - Benefits (would Relieve The Employee From The Burden, When Seeking To Prove A Recurrence Of A Work-related Incapacity To Work And The Need To Document A Comparative Change Of Medical Condition.)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Workers' Compensation - Benefits (would Relieve The Employee From The Burden, When Seeking To Prove A Recurrence Of A Work-related Incapacity To Work And The Need To Document A Comparative Change Of Medical Condition.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0228.pdf |