RI S0227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Irwin M. Rosen to join Christina Rose Dooling and Eric Paul Hediger in marriage on or about August 26, 2017, within the Town of New Shoreham, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-02 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/02/2017) |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/14/2017) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2017) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |