RI S0219 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the housing jobs department and a series of other initiatives designed to create jobs in housing construction, specifically affordable and low-income housing, green and solar energy jobs and programs for low-income individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Construction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-11SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2021)
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback