RI S0218 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts reusable bags not including paper or plastic bags from the state sales tax.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |