RI S0216 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state to reimburse the city/town for any costs associated with transporting children placed in foster care by RI-licensed child-placing agency or RI governmental agency to an educational facility outside the regional transportation district.
Title
Residence Of Children For School Purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0216.pdf |