RI S0214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the health services council to twenty-four (24) members and amends disclosure provisions of the hospital conversion act.
Title
The Hospital Conversion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0214.pdf |