RI S0214 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates tax incentives for the installation of alternative fuel facilities. Takes effect upon passage and this chapter would be repealed on January 1, 2020.
Title
Alternative Fuel Infrastructure Incentive
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0214.pdf |