RI S0212 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Seeks to advance economic development by guaranteeing students the right to enroll in approved career technical educational programs and allows them to enroll outside the district of residence if their district does not offer a duplicate program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Vocational Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09SenateSigned by Governor
2021-07-07SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-07-01HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-30SenateSenate passed Sub A
2021-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021)
2021-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-27SenateProposed Substitute
2021-06-25SenateScheduled for consideration (06/28/2021)
2021-06-25SenateMeeting postponed (06/30/2021)
2021-06-25SenateScheduled for consideration
2021-03-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2021)
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback