RI S0209 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updates Access to Advanced Placement Courses for All Students Act.
Title
Access To Advanced Placement Courses For All Students Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |