RI S0209 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts persons with a retail sales permit from requirement of paying a registration fee for making sales at a flea market.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--enforcement And Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |