RI S0206 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Middletown to issue not more than $190,000,000 in bonds and notes to finance school construction and renovation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Issue Not To Exceed $190,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Furnishing And Equipping Of A Middle School And High School And The Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of School Facilities Throughout The Town And All Attendant Expenses Including, But Not Limited To, Demolition, Engineering, Architectural And Landscaping Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-01HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-01SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-05-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023)
2023-05-25HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-05-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/25/2023)
2023-05-16HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-05-15HouseProposed Substitute
2023-05-12HouseScheduled for consideration (05/16/2023)
2023-03-29HouseReferred to House Finance
2023-03-28SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/28/2023)
2023-02-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023)
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback