RI S0204 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases membership of EFSB 3 to 5 members, revises process of energy facility siting to mandate participation of public, permits hearing officers to make findings on major non-generating facilities, sets forth requirements for public board members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Affairs And Government-- Energy Facility Siting Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023)
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback