RI S0202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Meeting postponed (06/26/2019)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits a food service establishment from providing a consumer with a single-use plastic straw unless requested by the consumer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Single-use Plastic Straws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseMeeting postponed (06/26/2019)
2019-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration
2019-06-12HouseReferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
2019-06-11SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-06SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019)
2019-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-04SenateProposed Substitute
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-05-29SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for consideration (05/29/2019)
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2019-04-30SenateProposed Substitute
2019-04-26SenateScheduled for consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-03-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback