RI S0200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Referred to House Special Legislation
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Referred to House Special Legislation
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a special motor vehicle registration plate for recipients of the United States Bronze Star Medal.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |