RI S0197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes player self-exclusion program with winnings collected from self-excluded players going to RICPG for research/education/prevention of teenage gambling addiction.
Title
Video-lottery Games, Table Games And Sports Wagering
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0197.pdf |