RI S0194 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Meeting postponed (06/30/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Meeting postponed (06/30/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases membership from 3 to 5 members/revises siting process to mandate public/municipal participation.
Title
Energy Facility Siting Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/15/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0194.pdf |