RI S0191 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a cause of action against an individual or entity that prohibits the possession of firearms on real property, except residences, by an individual that is authorized and licensed to carry a firearm.
Title
Procedure Generally - Causes Of Action
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0191.pdf |