RI S0183 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Fiscal Overseers, Budget Commissions And Receivers (would Limit The Duties And Powers Of A Fiscal Overseer, Budget Commission And Receiver Of A City Or Town To Financial Matters Only.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Fiscal Overseers, Budget Commissions And Receivers (would Limit The Duties And Powers Of A Fiscal Overseer, Budget Commission And Receiver Of A City Or Town To Financial Matters Only.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0183.pdf |