RI S0182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Thomas S. Kaplanes to join Autumn Yeo and Timothy Stauffer in marriage on or about June 24, 2017, within the Town of Narragansett, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-02 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/02/2017) |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/14/2017) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |