RI S0180 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Compels law enforcement agencies to provide a report identifying and describing any untested sexual assault collection kits.
Title
Sexual Assault- Statewide Accounting Of Unsubmitted Rape Kits
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Unsubmitted rape kits approval of amendment lc 000515/2 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2015) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2015) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2015) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |