RI S0179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits law enforcement from using Unmanned Aerial Vehicles without a proper warrant.
Title
Aerial Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0179.pdf |