RI S0177 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
2) MAXIMUM CLASS SIZE ACT (Mandates 20 students per classroom for kindergarten through second grade. Exceptions for emergencies and temporary situations, not to exceed 3 days and mid-year enrollments.
Title
The Kindergarten Through Grade Two
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to House Education |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/16/2023) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |