RI S0173 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires parking lots to designate parking spaces for electric vehicles/installation of charging stations for new existing public/private parking lots with fines for parking violations/compliance. Effective 7/1/21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parking Facilities And Privileges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2021-06-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021)
2021-06-24SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-23SenateProposed Substitute
2021-06-18SenateScheduled for consideration (06/24/2021)
2021-04-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021)
2021-02-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback