RI S0170 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires conservation and preservation restrictions to be liberally interpreted in favor of the grants awarded.
Title
Conservation And Preservation Restrictions On Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0170.pdf |