RI S0170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds alcohol and alcohol-related overdoses and possession or transportation of alcohol by an underage person, to the Good Samaritan Act.
Title
The Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention At Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/30/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |