RI S0158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Grant to eligible homeowners and renters to retrofit their residence to nationally recognized accessibility standards.
Title
Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |