RI S0158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates tax incentives for the installation of alternative fuel facilities.
Title
Alternative Fuel Infrastructure Incentive
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee heard |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0158.pdf |